U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00057-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Gaines et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 15, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • September 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 21, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 17, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • April 20, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Remark]
  • November 18, 2019: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Change of Address]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Reply to Response]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Response in Opposition]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Affidavit]
  • December 13, 2018: [Affidavit]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 05, 2018: [Change of Address]
  • November 05, 2018: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Withdraw Document]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 11, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • December 11, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • April 25, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 25, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • March 09, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 07, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 06, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • February 06, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 20, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2017: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Sealed Motion]
  • December 29, 2016: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 23, 2016: [Seal]
  • December 05, 2016: [Letter]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.