U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parish et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reply to Response]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Attachment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Release from Custody]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 07, 2020: [Reply to Response]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Order]
  • September 08, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Letter]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 16, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 25, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 25, 2020: [Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.