U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 20, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.