U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reddix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Withdrawal of Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 14, 2020: [Rebuttal]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 25, 2020: [Response]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 11, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 02, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2019: [Attachment]
  • July 10, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Remark]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 06, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 04, 2018: [Ex Parte Motion]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 09, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • March 07, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 02, 2018: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2017: [Letter]
  • December 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 15, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 08, 2017: [Response to Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Defendant Brief]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • September 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 01, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 04, 2017: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 01, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Reply to Response]
  • April 21, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
  • April 17, 2017: [Rebuttal]
  • April 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 14, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 13, 2017: [Rebuttal]
  • April 11, 2017: [Response in Support]
  • April 07, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 20, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • March 20, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 20, 2017: [Quash]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 08, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • October 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 20, 2016: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Attachment]
  • September 08, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 24, 2016: [Order of Recusal]
  • August 24, 2016: [Expedite]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • July 20, 2016: [Bond]
  • July 20, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • July 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 20, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.