U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duncan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 09, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 02, 2021: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 02, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 12, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • September 11, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 11, 2017: [Bond]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 28, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • September 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 15, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • September 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2016: [Bond]
  • September 12, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.