U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 02, 2018: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [USCA Order]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Extension of Time re Transcript]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • July 24, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 21, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 03, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 07, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 03, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 05, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 10, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 05, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 21, 2016: [Waiver]
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 20, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.