U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Reply to Response]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 27, 2022: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 15, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Attachment]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 10, 2016: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 10, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 10, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • August 10, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • August 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Case Inquiry Report]
  • July 21, 2016: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.