U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Song et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • December 02, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 19, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Subpoena Returned]
  • January 08, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 07, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • January 03, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 22, 2019: [Unseal Document]
  • November 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Remark]
  • August 02, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 12, 2018: [Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • March 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • January 10, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 01, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • November 22, 2016: [Change of Address]
  • November 10, 2016: [Letter]
  • November 03, 2016: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 27, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.