U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hilderbrand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • May 16, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • November 07, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • September 29, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 29, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.