U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00010-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 18, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Waiver]
  • July 09, 2018: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 03, 2018: [Unseal Document]
  • July 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.