U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00062-9
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 26, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Reduce Sentence - 2023 USSC Amendment 821]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 07, 2021: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 03, 2020: [Remark]
  • August 03, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Order for Warrant]
  • December 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • December 04, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Remark]
  • October 06, 2018: [Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Remark]
  • September 28, 2018: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • September 24, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 13, 2018: [Bond]
  • August 13, 2018: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • August 07, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 06, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 02, 2018: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 02, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 02, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 02, 2018: [Arraignment]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 06, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 23, 2017: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 23, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2017: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • October 03, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • August 08, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Hearing]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Remark]
  • April 21, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • September 16, 2016: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • August 29, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.