U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nguyen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 03, 2018: [Reconsideration]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.