U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:09-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 12, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Digital Audio File]
  • March 07, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 05, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • December 18, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • November 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • November 20, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 20, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 06, 2018: [Restricted Document]
  • November 06, 2018: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • November 06, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.