U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Longoria
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Order]
  • April 03, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 02, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • March 01, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 15, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 10, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • August 03, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2016: [Bond]
  • August 03, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice of Judicial Assignment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.