U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Malone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Restricted Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 05, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Response to Memorandum]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reduce Sentence - First Step Act]
  • December 13, 2021: [Vacate]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Sealed Transcript]
  • October 06, 2020: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • October 05, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 02, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 20, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • March 20, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • February 07, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • February 07, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Sealed Motion]
  • January 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • December 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing - Material Witness]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 26, 2019: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • November 14, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 01, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 23, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 18, 2019: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 18, 2019: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 17, 2019: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • October 11, 2019: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 15, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 06, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 10, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2016: [Discovery]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2016: [Bond]
  • August 03, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 25, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.