U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Change of Address]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Mail Returned]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Judgment - 2255]
  • January 08, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability Denied]
  • January 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Transcript Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.