U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deeds
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 03, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 18, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 17, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • May 17, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • May 15, 2017: [Waiver]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 15, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 01, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 15, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 15, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.