U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:13-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Bryant et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • May 29, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • July 29, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 16, 2019: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 18, 2019: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 13, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 06, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 21, 2019: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order to Unseal Document]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Discovery Hearing]
  • October 11, 2016: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.