U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:09-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Power et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Terminate Motions]
  • February 28, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Mail Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.