U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Redd et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • February 05, 2020: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • July 11, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 11, 2018: [Appeal Remark]
  • July 11, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 18, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Response]
  • October 02, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Letter]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Letter]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Remark]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Letter]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • September 06, 2016: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • August 31, 2016: [Restricted Document]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Order]
  • July 26, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.