U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Paige et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 18, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 18, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 13, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 10, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • December 08, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
October, 2016
  • October 07, 2016: [Order]
  • October 07, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 18, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 18, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2016: [Arraignment]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 29, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 26, 2016: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • July 26, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 26, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.