U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vaughn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Reply to Response]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 29, 2021: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Change of Address]
  • September 27, 2021: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 23, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
  • January 12, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 12, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Judgment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 20, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 06, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 06, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • March 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2017: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 02, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • February 21, 2017: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Continue]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 06, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 27, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.