U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 14, 2018: [Digital Audio File]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sentencing]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2016
  • November 06, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 09, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 27, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.