U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:07-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 06, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • July 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.