U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Change of Address]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 06, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order for Warrant]
  • March 09, 2022: [Exhibit List]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Exhibit List]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Letter]
  • June 22, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 11, 2021: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2020: [Attachment]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • September 18, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Digital Audio File]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Restricted Document]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 20, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 06, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • February 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 04, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • February 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Jury Trial]
  • January 29, 2019: [Response]
  • January 28, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 23, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 10, 2019: [In Limine]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continue]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • October 03, 2018: [Trial Order]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 03, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 03, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 13, 2018: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • June 13, 2018: [Restricted Document]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • February 28, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • October 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Letter]
  • August 16, 2017: [Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
March, 2017
  • March 23, 2017: [Writ Issued]
  • March 23, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • March 22, 2017: [Application for Writ]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Change Venue]
  • July 27, 2016: [New Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.