U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Granados et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
  • February 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 24, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2017: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2017: [Dismiss]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 31, 2016: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order to Show Cause]
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2016: [Continue]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 23, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 21, 2016: [Discovery]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 25, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 23, 2016: [Sever Defendant]
  • August 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 22, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
  • August 22, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 22, 2016: [Response]
  • August 19, 2016: [Response]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order]
  • August 18, 2016: [Medical Treatment]
  • August 18, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • August 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 17, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 12, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 09, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • August 09, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 03, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 03, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 03, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 27, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.