U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grant
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 15, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • June 29, 2017: [CJA Appointment Order]
  • June 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • June 29, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.