U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendoza-Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 19, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • December 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • September 21, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 12, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 09, 2016: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 17, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 17, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 04, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 04, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • July 27, 2016: [Restricted Document]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.