U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davenport
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 17, 2016: [Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order]
  • September 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.