U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-00006-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Paul et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Remark]
  • March 29, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2017
  • April 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.