U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:03-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Raiford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 24, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • August 26, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 26, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 21, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 07, 2020: [Restricted Document]
  • August 07, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • August 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • August 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order]
  • July 29, 2020: [Attachment]
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • July 28, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 28, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 27, 2020: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 28, 2020: [Letter]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Clarify]
  • November 13, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 08, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.