U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:96-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Culley, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 09, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • December 05, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2022: [Remark]
  • November 30, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.