U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sutton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 11, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 10, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 31, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 29, 2016: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order of Detention]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 29, 2016: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.