U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burkes-Palmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • January 24, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 24, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.