U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:03-cr-00067-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 05, 2022: [Change of Address]
  • May 05, 2022: [Reconsideration]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 24, 2022: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Digital Audio File]
  • July 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 03, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2021: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • May 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 01, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
May, 2017
  • May 03, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
April, 2017
  • April 21, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 05, 2017: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.