U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-00020-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Morgan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
  • August 25, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • October 24, 2016: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • October 24, 2016: [Notice of Intent to Request Redaction re Transcript]
  • October 23, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 16, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 15, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.