U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:12-cr-00133-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Mail Returned]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.