U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • August 14, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • July 19, 2017: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.