U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:01-cr-00117-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acreman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 21, 2016: [In Chambers Conference]
  • September 08, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • September 07, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.