U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00077-5
  • Case Name: USA v. Gentry et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response]
  • April 10, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation or Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 23, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Remark]
  • May 03, 2022: [Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 03, 2022: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Response]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • February 11, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • February 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • December 13, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [USCA Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 09, 2020: [Reconsideration]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 05, 2020: [Appeal Remark]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 17, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • June 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 08, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 05, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice fee paid(credit card)]
  • June 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Remark]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2020: [Reply to Response]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 29, 2020: [Order]
  • April 28, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2020: [Order]
  • April 17, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Case Inquiry Report]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 03, 2017: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • October 03, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 15, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 15, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 15, 2017: [Unseal Document]
  • September 15, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 19, 2016: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 02, 2016: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.