U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:04-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Summers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 08, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 24, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 18, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.