U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hubbard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sealed Document]
  • November 22, 2016: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 22, 2016: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit - Court]
  • November 22, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 22, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • November 17, 2016: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
September, 2016
  • September 14, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 31, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 31, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order]
  • August 09, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.