U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:06-cr-00212-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 25, 2016: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • August 25, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2016: [Arrest]
  • August 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.