U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wash
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [U.S. Marshal's Return]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 19, 2017: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Restricted Document]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2017: [Service by Publication]
  • February 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2017: [Restricted Document]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 31, 2017: [Sentencing]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 07, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Hearing]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • September 20, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 20, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2016: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.