U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:10-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clemons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • July 21, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 06, 2020: [Docket Annotation]
  • July 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • June 30, 2020: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • June 29, 2020: [Consent By Videoconference]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 26, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 26, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Copy of Opinion - USCA]
  • August 24, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2016: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • November 10, 2016: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 09, 2016: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • November 07, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2016: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • November 02, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 01, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
  • October 14, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 14, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2016: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • October 11, 2016: [Bench Trial - Begun]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 31, 2016: [Response]
  • August 31, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 26, 2016: [Transcript (DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS)]
  • August 22, 2016: [Contempt]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 05, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 05, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.