U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Plaza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 04, 2019: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • September 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Petition re: Probation/Supervised Release (12B)]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.