U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cr-00012-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Miller et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Transcript - Appeal]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript Request - Appeal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 12, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit]
  • March 11, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • August 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Conventional Filing]
  • June 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document Under Seal or Restricted]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 15, 2020: [Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Compassionate Release (COVID-19)]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 12, 2019: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Remark]
  • February 19, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • February 14, 2019: [Change of Address]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2019: [Letter]
  • January 28, 2019: [Change of Address]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Certified Copy of USCA Judgment/Mandate]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Electronic Record on Appeal Accepted]
  • December 21, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 06, 2016: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Appeal Remark]
  • November 03, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Reply to Response]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 05, 2016: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 03, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 03, 2016: [Affidavit]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Affidavit]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Vacate (2255) * FILE CONVENTIONALLY *]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.