U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:06-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Owens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
February, 2017
  • February 13, 2017: [Subpoena Returned]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 19, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 18, 2017: [Exhibit (Document)]
  • January 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Petition for Warrant/Summons (12C)]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.