U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 22, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 16, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 16, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2017: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 03, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2017: [Digital Audio File]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2016: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • October 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 25, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • October 17, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 15, 2016: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 15, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 12, 2016: [Continue]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 26, 2016: [Digital Audio File]
  • August 26, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • August 08, 2016: [Trial Order]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 08, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.