U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maillet
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2016: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • August 08, 2016: [Unseal Document]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.